Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2035 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 10, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 21, 2023
Bill May 24, 2023
Bill May 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023