House
|
05/23/2023
|
Postponed
|
11/13/23 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4964
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 4964
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4963
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 3210
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3210
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4963
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3210
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 527
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|