Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2052 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 14, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 15, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 15, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2023