E
|
05/19/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
E
|
05/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1663
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1656
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3153
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1142
|
Journal Page: 3152
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3152
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3152
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3153
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1047
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 4070
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2341
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1401
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1379
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1379
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1379
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1379
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Johnson
|
Journal Page: 1378
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1378
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1378
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1142
|
Journal Page: 3152
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1356
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 530
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|