Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2069 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/24/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 2069
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2023; March 21, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 24, 2023,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 3;
 April 24, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the required posting of signs regarding human
 trafficking penalties by certain schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.086(a)(2), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (2)  "School" means a public [or private] primary or
 secondary school.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *