House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1840 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1190 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1190 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1190 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1190 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1127 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1127 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1127 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Bettencourt | Journal Page: 1127 |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1127 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2464 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |