Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2071 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/13/2023

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 2071
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2023; March 21, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 13, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 2; April 13, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2071 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to automatic recounts of certain elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 216.001, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 216.001.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter
 applies only to an election that results in:
 (1)  a tie vote as provided by Sections 2.002(i),
 2.023(b) and (c), and 2.028;
 (2)  a candidate defeated or eliminated by one-half of
 one percent or less of the votes cast for that office; or
 (3)  a measure submitted to voters that is approved or
 defeated by one-half of one percent or less of the votes cast on
 that measure.
 SECTION 2.  Section 216.004, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 216.004.  COUNTING PROCEDURES. (a) The method of
 counting votes in an automatic recount consists of using a
 generally accepted sampling technique to sample the following for
 discrepancies:
 (1)  100 percent of electronic ballots;
 (2)  five percent of early voting ballots voted by
 mail;
 (3)  five percent of the polling place locations
 established for early voting; and
 (4)  five percent of the polling place locations
 established for election day [is the same method of counting used in
 the election that resulted in the tie vote].
 (b)  If the authority designated under Section 212.026
 determines there are discrepancies of one percent or greater for
 any of the four categories based on the statistical sample under
 Subsection (a), the authority shall order a recount under Section
 216.003.
 (c)  The secretary of state shall adopt rules and procedures
 for the implementation of this section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *