E
|
05/24/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
E
|
05/12/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4048
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3154
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1143
|
Journal Page: 3153
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3153
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3153
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Walle
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 4318
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1837
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1185
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1081
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 532
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|