Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2085 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2085


 AN ACT
 relating to a grant program for crime victim notification systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 772.0079 to read as follows:
 Sec. 772.0079.  GRANT PROGRAM FOR CRIME VICTIM NOTIFICATION
 SYSTEMS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Criminal justice division" means the criminal
 justice division established under Section 772.006.
 (2)  "Law enforcement agency" means an agency of the
 state or an agency of a political subdivision of the state
 authorized by law to employ peace officers.
 (3)  "Victim" means a person who has suffered personal
 injury or death as a result of the criminal conduct of another.
 (b)  The criminal justice division shall establish and
 administer a grant program to provide financial assistance to a law
 enforcement agency for purposes of purchasing or developing a crime
 victim notification system.
 (c)  The criminal justice division shall establish:
 (1)  eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
 (2)  grant application procedures;
 (3)  criteria for evaluating grant applications and
 awarding grants;
 (4)  guidelines related to grant amounts; and
 (5)  procedures for monitoring the use of a grant
 awarded under this section and ensuring compliance with any
 conditions of the grant.
 (d)  A crime victim notification system for which a law
 enforcement agency seeks a grant under this section must:
 (1)  notify a victim or relative of a deceased victim by
 e-mail or text message of all of the following regarding a victim's
 case:
 (A)  the date on which the incident report is
 created;
 (B)  the case number;
 (C)  the names of investigators who are assigned
 to the case;
 (D)  the date:
 (i)  an arrest is made; and
 (ii)  an affidavit alleging probable cause
 is presented to the attorney representing the state; and
 (E)  any other information relevant to the case;
 (2)  interface with the law enforcement agency's system
 of records;
 (3)  provide configurable triggers to directly send
 messages;
 (4)  provide the capability:
 (A)  to attach informational brochures or other
 electronic attachments to the messages; and
 (B)  for a person to check the status of the case
 with the law enforcement agency;
 (5)  monitor the number and types of messages sent and
 enable the law enforcement agency to visualize that data; and
 (6)  provide a survey tool so the law enforcement
 agency can solicit feedback on victims services.
 (e)  Information in the crime victim notification system is
 confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552.
 (f)  The criminal justice division may use any available
 revenue for purposes of this section.
 (g)  As a condition of receiving a grant under this section,
 a law enforcement agency shall periodically report to the criminal
 justice division the number and types of notifications sent using
 the crime victim notification system.
 (h)  Not later than December 30 of each year, the criminal
 justice division shall compile the information described by
 Subsection (g) into a written report provided to the legislature.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2085 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 11, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2085 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 5, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 124,
 Nays 18, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor