Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2087 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 03/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hughes S.B. No. 2087
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2023; March 21, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 30, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 1; March 30, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from jury service for the spouse of an
 officer or employee in the legislative branch of government.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 62.106(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A person qualified to serve as a petit juror may
 establish an exemption from jury service if the person:
 (1)  is over 70 years of age;
 (2)  has legal custody of a child younger than 12 years
 of age and the person's service on the jury requires leaving the
 child without adequate supervision;
 (3)  is a student of a public or private secondary
 school;
 (4)  is a person enrolled and in actual attendance at an
 institution of higher education;
 (5)  is an officer or an employee, or the spouse of an
 officer or employee, of the senate, the house of representatives,
 or any department, commission, board, office, or other agency in
 the legislative branch of state government;
 (6)  is summoned for service in a county with a
 population of at least 200,000, unless that county uses a jury plan
 under Section 62.011 and the period authorized under Section
 62.011(b)(5) exceeds two years, and the person has served as a petit
 juror in the county during the 24-month period preceding the date
 the person is to appear for jury service;
 (7)  is the primary caretaker of a person who is unable
 to care for himself or herself;
 (8)  except as provided by Subsection (b), is summoned
 for service in a county with a population of at least 250,000 and
 the person has served as a petit juror in the county during the
 three-year period preceding the date the person is to appear for
 jury service; or
 (9)  is a member of the United States military forces
 serving on active duty and deployed to a location away from the
 person's home station and out of the person's county of residence.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *