Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to Public Education: May 4 2023 8:56PM
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23