Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2091 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 25, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 8, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis June 8, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis March 25, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023