Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2171 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 12, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 18, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 22, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2023