E | 05/19/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/09/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1633 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3151 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1140 | Journal Page: 3151 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3151 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3151 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2986 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2986 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 3317 | Journal Page: 2986 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3074 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Health Care Reform, Select | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2338 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1366 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1309 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1184 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2464 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |