Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 7, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 13, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023