E | 06/18/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3310 | |
E | 05/29/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/29/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6486 | |
Senate | 05/28/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3197 | |
Senate | 05/27/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3176 | |
Senate | 05/25/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2764 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5176 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5183 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Record vote | RV#2039 | Journal Page: 5183 |
House | 05/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 5183 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5183 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5168 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5168 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4997 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2908 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2908 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2790 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1491 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2908 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2908 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |