E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5895
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3008
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3008
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5545
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2132
|
Journal Page: 5544
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5544
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1607
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1607
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3080
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3080
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1438
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1438
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1438
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1438
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1317
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#481
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Metcalf
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Metcalf
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1580
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 905
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 551
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 551
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 551
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 579
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 539
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 505
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 379
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 251
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 233
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 165
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|