Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB222 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 222
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to paid leave by certain state employees for the birth or
66 adoption of a child.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Section 661.912, Government Code, is amended to
99 read as follows:
1010 Sec. 661.912. FAMILY AND MEDICAL LEAVE ACT. (a) Except as
1111 provided by Section 661.9125, to [To] the extent required by
1212 federal law, a state employee who has a total of at least 12 months
1313 of state service and who has worked at least 1,250 hours during the
1414 12-month period preceding the beginning of leave under this section
1515 is entitled to leave under the federal Family and Medical Leave Act
1616 of 1993 (29 U.S.C. Section 2601 et seq.).
1717 (b) The employee must first use all available and applicable
1818 paid vacation and sick leave while taking leave under this section,
1919 except that an employee who is receiving temporary disability
2020 benefits or workers' compensation benefits or is taking paid leave
2121 under Section 661.9125 is not required to first use applicable paid
2222 vacation or sick leave while receiving those benefits or taking
2323 paid leave under Section 661.9125.
2424 SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 661, Government Code, is
2525 amended by adding Section 661.9125 to read as follows:
2626 Sec. 661.9125. PAID PARENTAL LEAVE FOR CERTAIN EMPLOYEES.
2727 (a) This section applies only to a state employee who:
2828 (1) is a member of the Employees Retirement System of
2929 Texas or is employed by a board, commission, department, or other
3030 agency in the executive branch of state government created by the
3131 constitution or a statute of this state, except for an institution
3232 of higher education as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code;
3333 and
3434 (2) takes leave under Section 661.912 for the:
3535 (A) birth of a child;
3636 (B) birth of a child by the employee's spouse;
3737 (C) birth of a child by a gestational surrogate;
3838 or
3939 (D) adoption of a child.
4040 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), a state employee
4141 who takes leave under Section 661.912 for the purpose of Subsection
4242 (a)(2)(A) is entitled to 40 days of paid leave during leave taken
4343 under that section.
4444 (c) A state employee who takes leave under Section 661.912
4545 for the purpose of Subsection (a)(2)(B), (C), or (D) is entitled to
4646 20 days of paid leave during leave taken under Section 661.912.
4747 (d) This section does not entitle an employee to any leave
4848 in addition to leave taken under Section 661.912.
4949 (e) A state employee is not required to use all available
5050 paid vacation and sick leave before the employee is entitled to take
5151 paid leave under this section.
5252 (f) This section may not be construed to:
5353 (1) create an employment right;
5454 (2) confer a protected status; or
5555 (3) create a cause of action against this state.
5656 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
5757 ______________________________ ______________________________
5858 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
5959 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 222 passed the Senate on
6060 March 22, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
6161 May 1, 2023, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
6262 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 5, 2023, House
6363 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2023, Senate adopted
6464 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
6565 Nays 0.
6666 ______________________________
6767 Secretary of the Senate
6868 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 222 passed the House, with
6969 amendments, on April 25, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
7070 Nays 9, one present not voting; May 5, 2023, House granted request
7171 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
7272 May 25, 2023, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
7373 following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 3, two present not voting.
7474 ______________________________
7575 Chief Clerk of the House
7676 Approved:
7777 ______________________________
7878 Date
7979 ______________________________
8080 Governor