Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB222 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 222


 AN ACT
 relating to paid leave by certain state employees for the birth or
 adoption of a child.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 661.912, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 661.912.  FAMILY AND MEDICAL LEAVE ACT.  (a)  Except as
 provided by Section 661.9125, to [To] the extent required by
 federal law, a state employee who has a total of at least 12 months
 of state service and who has worked at least 1,250 hours during the
 12-month period preceding the beginning of leave under this section
 is entitled to leave under the federal Family and Medical Leave Act
 of 1993 (29 U.S.C. Section 2601 et seq.).
 (b)  The employee must first use all available and applicable
 paid vacation and sick leave while taking leave under this section,
 except that an employee who is receiving temporary disability
 benefits or workers' compensation benefits or is taking paid leave
 under Section 661.9125 is not required to first use applicable paid
 vacation or sick leave while receiving those benefits or taking
 paid leave under Section 661.9125.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 661, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 661.9125 to read as follows:
 Sec. 661.9125.  PAID PARENTAL LEAVE FOR CERTAIN EMPLOYEES.
 (a)  This section applies only to a state employee who:
 (1)  is a member of the Employees Retirement System of
 Texas or is employed by a board, commission, department, or other
 agency in the executive branch of state government created by the
 constitution or a statute of this state, except for an institution
 of higher education as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code;
 and
 (2)  takes leave under Section 661.912 for the:
 (A)  birth of a child;
 (B)  birth of a child by the employee's spouse;
 (C)  birth of a child by a gestational surrogate;
 or
 (D)  adoption of a child.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a state employee
 who takes leave under Section 661.912 for the purpose of Subsection
 (a)(2)(A) is entitled to 40 days of paid leave during leave taken
 under that section.
 (c)  A state employee who takes leave under Section 661.912
 for the purpose of Subsection (a)(2)(B), (C), or (D) is entitled to
 20 days of paid leave during leave taken under Section 661.912.
 (d)  This section does not entitle an employee to any leave
 in addition to leave taken under Section 661.912.
 (e)  A state employee is not required to use all available
 paid vacation and sick leave before the employee is entitled to take
 paid leave under this section.
 (f)  This section may not be construed to:
 (1)  create an employment right;
 (2)  confer a protected status; or
 (3)  create a cause of action against this state.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 222 passed the Senate on
 March 22, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 1, 2023, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 5, 2023, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2023, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 222 passed the House, with
 amendments, on April 25, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 139,
 Nays 9, one present not voting; May 5, 2023, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 25, 2023, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 3, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor