E
|
05/29/2023
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
E
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4550
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2010
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4350
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1741
|
Journal Page: 4349
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4349
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4349
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4270
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4270
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/15/23 4:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3468
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 474
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 395
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 379
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 336
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 328
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 233
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 165
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|