1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2258 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to authorizing certain cities to change the date on which |
---|
6 | 6 | | their general election for officers is held. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 9 | | amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (f) to read as |
---|
10 | 10 | | follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (c) A home-rule city may implement a [the] change authorized |
---|
12 | 12 | | by this section [Subsection (a)] or provide for the election of all |
---|
13 | 13 | | members of the governing body at the same election through the |
---|
14 | 14 | | adoption of a resolution. The change contained in the resolution |
---|
15 | 15 | | supersedes a city charter provision that requires a different |
---|
16 | 16 | | general election date or that requires the terms of members of the |
---|
17 | 17 | | governing body to be staggered. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (f) The governing body of a city with a population of 9,000 |
---|
19 | 19 | | or less, located predominantly in a county that has a total area of |
---|
20 | 20 | | less than 4,800 square miles, that has adopted a council-manager |
---|
21 | 21 | | form of government and that holds its general election for officers |
---|
22 | 22 | | on a date other than the November uniform election date may, not |
---|
23 | 23 | | later than December 31, 2024, change the date on which it holds its |
---|
24 | 24 | | general election for officers to the November uniform election |
---|
25 | 25 | | date. Subsections (b), (c), and (d) apply to the change of an |
---|
26 | 26 | | election date under this subsection. This subsection expires |
---|
27 | 27 | | January 1, 2025. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
29 | 29 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
30 | 30 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
31 | 31 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2258 passed the Senate on |
---|
32 | 32 | | April 27, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
33 | 33 | | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | 34 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
35 | 35 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2258 passed the House on |
---|
36 | 36 | | May 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 11, |
---|
37 | 37 | | two present not voting. |
---|
38 | 38 | | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | 39 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
40 | 40 | | Approved: |
---|
41 | 41 | | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | 42 | | Date |
---|
43 | 43 | | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | 44 | | Governor |
---|