Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2258 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/15/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2258


 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain cities to change the date on which
 their general election for officers is held.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  A home-rule city may implement a [the] change authorized
 by this section [Subsection (a)] or provide for the election of all
 members of the governing body at the same election through the
 adoption of a resolution. The change contained in the resolution
 supersedes a city charter provision that requires a different
 general election date or that requires the terms of members of the
 governing body to be staggered.
 (f)  The governing body of a city with a population of 9,000
 or less, located predominantly in a county that has a total area of
 less than 4,800 square miles, that has adopted a council-manager
 form of government and that holds its general election for officers
 on a date other than the November uniform election date may, not
 later than December 31, 2024, change the date on which it holds its
 general election for officers to the November uniform election
 date. Subsections (b), (c), and (d) apply to the change of an
 election date under this subsection.  This subsection expires
 January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2258 passed the Senate on
 April 27, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2258 passed the House on
 May 12, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 129, Nays 11,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor