House | 05/17/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 4529 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4529 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4562 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2066 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4529 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |