Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2287 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/15/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West, LaMantia S.B. No. 2287
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 22, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 15, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2287 By:  Flores


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a peace officer to apprehend a person
 for emergency detention and the authority of certain facilities and
 physicians to temporarily detain a person with mental illness.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter A, Chapter 573, Health
 and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER A.  APPREHENSION, [BY PEACE OFFICER OR] TRANSPORTATION,
 OR DETENTION WITHOUT JUDGE'S OR MAGISTRATE'S ORDER [FOR EMERGENCY
 DETENTION BY GUARDIAN]
 SECTION 2.  Section 573.001(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A peace officer, without a warrant, may take a person
 into custody, regardless of the age or location of the person, if
 the officer:
 (1)  has reason to believe and does believe that:
 (A)  the person is a person with mental illness;
 and
 (B)  because of that mental illness there is a
 substantial risk of serious harm to the person or to others unless
 the person is immediately restrained; and
 (2)  believes that there is not sufficient time to
 obtain a warrant before taking the person into custody.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 573, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 573.006 to read as follows:
 Sec. 573.006.  TEMPORARY DETENTION IN CERTAIN FACILITIES.
 (a)  In this section, "facility" means:
 (1)  an inpatient mental health facility other than a
 community center, a facility operated by or under contract with a
 community center, an entity that the executive commissioner
 designates to provide mental health services, a local mental health
 authority, or a facility operated by or under contract with a local
 mental health authority, unless the facility is licensed under
 Chapter 577;
 (2)  a hospital, or the emergency department of a
 hospital, licensed under Chapter 241; and
 (3)  a freestanding emergency medical care facility
 licensed under Chapter 254.
 (b)  The governing body of a facility may adopt and implement
 a written policy that provides for the facility or a physician at
 the facility to detain a person who voluntarily requested treatment
 from the facility or who lacks the capacity to consent to treatment,
 as provided by this section, if:
 (1)  the person expresses a desire to leave the
 facility or attempts to leave the facility before the examination
 or treatment is completed; and
 (2)  a physician at the facility:
 (A)  has reason to believe and does believe that:
 (i)  the person has a mental illness; and
 (ii)  because of that mental illness there
 is a substantial risk of serious harm to the person or to others
 unless the person is immediately restrained; and
 (B)  believes that there is not sufficient time to
 file an application for emergency detention or for an order of
 protective custody.
 (c)  A policy adopted and implemented by a facility under
 this section may not allow the facility or a physician at the
 facility to detain a person who has been transported to the facility
 for emergency detention under this chapter.
 (d)  A policy adopted and implemented by a facility under
 this section must require:
 (1)  the facility staff or the physician who intends to
 detain the person under the policy to notify the person of that
 intention;
 (2)  a physician to document a decision by the facility
 or the physician to detain a person under the policy and to place a
 notice of detention in the person's medical record that contains
 the same information as required in a peace officer's notification
 of detention under Section 573.002; and
 (3)  the period of a person's detention under the policy
 to be less than four hours following the time the person first
 expressed a desire to leave, or attempted to leave, the facility,
 and the facility or physician to release the person not later than
 the end of the four-hour period unless the facility staff or
 physician arranges for a peace officer to take the person into
 custody under Section 573.001 or an order of protective custody is
 issued.
 (e)  Detention of a person under a policy adopted and
 implemented by a facility under this section is not considered
 involuntary psychiatric hospitalization for purposes of Section
 411.172(e), Government Code.
 (f)  A physician, person, or facility that detains or does
 not detain a person under a policy adopted and implemented by a
 facility under this section and that acts in good faith and without
 malice is not civilly or criminally liable for that action.
 (g)  A facility is not civilly or criminally liable for the
 decision of the governing body of the facility to adopt or not to
 adopt a policy under this section.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *