Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2310 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 1, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 11, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis July 7, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 7, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis April 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note April 2, 2023