Senate | 05/18/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2058 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 398 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |