LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB2334
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB2334
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB2334
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/08/2023
9:00 am
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.036
SB2334
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Left pending in committee
HB300
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
HB1038
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1393
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB3345
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB3651
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB4015
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB4381
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23