Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 21, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 11, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 25, 2023