Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2376 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 2376
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the issuance of Support Adoption specialty license
66 plates and to the Support Adoption account and certain voluntary
77 contributions to that account.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. The heading to Section 402.036, Government Code,
1010 is amended to read as follows:
1111 Sec. 402.036. SUPPORT ADOPTION [CHOOSE LIFE] ACCOUNT.
1212 SECTION 2. Sections 402.036(a), (b), (b-1), (e), (f), and
1313 (g), Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
1414 (a) The Support Adoption [Choose Life] account is a separate
1515 account in the general revenue fund. The account is composed of:
1616 (1) money deposited to the credit of the account under
1717 Sections [Section] 504.662 and 521.015, Transportation Code; and
1818 (2) gifts, grants, donations, and legislative
1919 appropriations.
2020 (b) The attorney general administers the Support Adoption
2121 [Choose Life] account. The attorney general may spend money
2222 credited to the account only to:
2323 (1) make grants to an eligible organization; and
2424 (2) defray the cost of administering the account,
2525 including the cost of advertising authorized by Subsection (b-1).
2626 (b-1) The attorney general may advertise that fees paid for
2727 the issuance of a license plate in accordance with Section 504.662,
2828 Transportation Code, may be used to fund the grants described by
2929 Subsection (b)(1), provided that the money spent under this
3030 subsection does not exceed two percent of the amount of gross
3131 receipts deposited to the Support Adoption [Choose Life] account
3232 during the preceding state fiscal year.
3333 (e) The attorney general by rule shall establish:
3434 (1) guidelines for the expenditure of money credited
3535 to the Support Adoption [Choose Life] account; and
3636 (2) reporting and other mechanisms necessary to ensure
3737 that the money is spent in accordance with this section.
3838 (f) Money received by an eligible organization under this
3939 section may be spent only to provide for the material needs of
4040 pregnant women who are considering placing their children for
4141 adoption, including the provision of clothing, housing, prenatal
4242 care, food, utilities, and transportation, to provide for the needs
4343 of children [infants] who are awaiting placement with adoptive
4444 parents, to provide training and advertising relating to adoption,
4545 and to provide pregnancy testing or pre-adoption or postadoption
4646 counseling, but may not be used to pay an administrative, legal, or
4747 capital expense.
4848 (g) In this section, "eligible organization" means:
4949 (1) an organization in this state that:
5050 (A) [(1)] is exempt from federal income taxation
5151 under Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by being
5252 listed as an exempt charitable organization under Section 501(c)(3)
5353 of that code;
5454 (B) [(2)] provides counseling and material
5555 assistance to pregnant women who are considering placing their
5656 children for adoption or to prospective adoptive parents;
5757 (C) [(3)] does not charge for services provided,
5858 except for adoption-related costs or fees;
5959 (D) [(4)] does not provide abortions or
6060 abortion-related services or make referrals to abortion providers;
6161 (E) [(5)] is not affiliated with an organization
6262 that provides abortions or abortion-related services or makes
6363 referrals to abortion providers; and
6464 (F) [(6)] does not contract with an organization
6565 that provides abortions or abortion-related services or makes
6666 referrals to abortion providers;
6767 (2) an adoption agency, as defined by Section 162.402,
6868 Family Code; and
6969 (3) an authorized agency, as defined by Section
7070 162.402, Family Code.
7171 SECTION 3. The heading to Section 402.037, Government Code,
7272 is amended to read as follows:
7373 Sec. 402.037. SUPPORT ADOPTION [CHOOSE LIFE] ADVISORY
7474 COMMITTEE.
7575 SECTION 4. Sections 402.037(a) and (b), Government Code,
7676 are amended to read as follows:
7777 (a) The attorney general shall appoint a seven-member
7878 Support Adoption [Choose Life] advisory committee.
7979 (b) The committee shall:
8080 (1) meet at least twice a year or as called by the
8181 attorney general;
8282 (2) assist the attorney general in developing rules
8383 under Section 402.036(e); and
8484 (3) review and make recommendations to the attorney
8585 general on applications submitted to the attorney general for
8686 grants funded with money credited to the Support Adoption [Choose
8787 Life] account.
8888 SECTION 5. Section 504.662, Transportation Code, is amended
8989 to read as follows:
9090 Sec. 504.662. SUPPORT ADOPTION [CHOOSE LIFE] LICENSE
9191 PLATES. (a) The department shall issue specially designed
9292 license plates that include the words "Support Adoption [Choose
9393 Life]." The department shall design the license plates in
9494 consultation with the attorney general.
9595 (b) After deduction of the department's administrative
9696 costs, the department shall deposit the remainder of the fee for
9797 issuance of license plates under this section in the state treasury
9898 to the credit of the Support Adoption [Choose Life] account
9999 established by Section 402.036, Government Code.
100100 SECTION 6. Subchapter A, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
101101 is amended by adding Section 521.015 to read as follows:
102102 Sec. 521.015. VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION TO SUPPORT
103103 ADOPTION. (a) When a person applies for an original or renewal
104104 driver's license or personal identification certificate under this
105105 chapter, the person may contribute any amount to the Support
106106 Adoption account established by Section 402.036, Government Code,
107107 to support adoption.
108108 (b) The department shall:
109109 (1) include space on the first page of each
110110 application for an original or renewal driver's license or personal
111111 identification certificate that allows a person applying for an
112112 original or renewal driver's license or personal identification
113113 certificate to indicate the amount that the person is voluntarily
114114 contributing to the account; and
115115 (2) provide an opportunity for the person to
116116 contribute to the account during the application process for an
117117 original or renewal driver's license or personal identification
118118 certificate on the department's Internet website.
119119 (c) The department shall send any contribution made under
120120 this section to the comptroller for deposit to the credit of the
121121 Support Adoption account established by Section 402.036,
122122 Government Code, not later than the 14th day of each month. Before
123123 sending the money to the comptroller, the department may deduct
124124 money equal to the amount of reasonable expenses for administering
125125 this section.
126126 SECTION 7. Not later than December 31, 2023, the Department
127127 of Public Safety shall provide an opportunity for a person who
128128 applies for an original or renewal driver's license or personal
129129 identification certificate to make a voluntary contribution to
130130 support adoption, as required by Section 521.015, Transportation
131131 Code, as added by this Act.
132132 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
133133 ______________________________ ______________________________
134134 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
135135 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2376 passed the Senate on
136136 May 15, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; and that the
137137 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2023, by the
138138 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
139139 ______________________________
140140 Secretary of the Senate
141141 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2376 passed the House, with
142142 amendment, on May 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
143143 Nays 0, one present not voting.
144144 ______________________________
145145 Chief Clerk of the House
146146 Approved:
147147 ______________________________
148148 Date
149149 ______________________________
150150 Governor