Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 11, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 9, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 12, 2023