Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2406 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 2406
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 23, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural
 Affairs; April 17, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2406 By:  Flores


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of hospitals in certain counties to drill
 a water well for the purpose of producing water for use in the event
 of an emergency or natural disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 311, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 311.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 311.005.  WATER WELLS FOR USE BY HOSPITALS IN CERTAIN
 COUNTIES IN EVENT OF EMERGENCY OR NATURAL DISASTER. (a) This
 section applies only to a hospital located in a county that:
 (1)  has a population of more than 250,000; and
 (2)  borders the Neches River.
 (b)  A hospital to which this section applies may drill a
 water well on property owned by the hospital for the purpose of
 producing water to supplement the hospital's water supply in the
 event that an emergency or natural disaster prevents the hospital
 from receiving water from the hospital's usual source.
 (c)  This section does not affect the authority of a
 groundwater conservation district to regulate groundwater
 production under Chapter 36, Water Code, or other law governing a
 groundwater conservation district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *