Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 11, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 21, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023