House | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 4384 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4384 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4316 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1885 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1885 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1885 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1885 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1885 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1885 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1885 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4384 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |