Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2428 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 17, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023