Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2440 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 31, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 9, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023