E
|
06/16/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5894
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3028
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5194
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2046
|
Journal Page: 5193
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5193
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Hernandez
|
Journal Page: 5193
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5193
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2024
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Howard
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5119
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3071
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1515
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1515
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1515
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1515
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5119
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1459
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1459
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1459
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 1458
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1490
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|