Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2453 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 2453
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to certain regulations adopted by governmental entities
66 for the building products, materials, or methods used in the
77 construction of residential or commercial buildings.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Section 3000.002(c), Government Code, is amended
1010 to read as follows:
1111 (c) This section does not apply to:
1212 (1) a program established by a state agency that
1313 requires particular standards, incentives, or financing
1414 arrangements in order to comply with requirements of a state or
1515 federal funding source or housing program;
1616 (2) a requirement for a building necessary to consider
1717 the building eligible for windstorm and hail insurance coverage
1818 under Chapter 2210, Insurance Code;
1919 (3) an ordinance or other regulation that regulates
2020 outdoor lighting that is adopted for the purpose of reducing light
2121 pollution and that:
2222 (A) is adopted by a governmental entity that is
2323 certified as a Dark Sky Community by the International Dark-Sky
2424 Association as part of the International Dark Sky Places Program;
2525 (B) is adopted by a governmental entity that has
2626 adopted a resolution stating the entity's intent to become
2727 certified as a Dark Sky Community by the International Dark-Sky
2828 Association as part of the International Dark Sky Places Program
2929 and does not regulate outdoor lighting in a manner that is more
3030 restrictive than the prohibitions or limitations required to become
3131 certified as a Dark Sky Community; or
3232 (C) applies to outdoor lighting within five miles
3333 of the boundary of a military base in which an active training
3434 program is conducted;
3535 (4) an ordinance or order that:
3636 (A) regulates outdoor lighting; and
3737 (B) is adopted under Subchapter B, Chapter 229,
3838 Local Government Code, or Subchapter B, Chapter 240, Local
3939 Government Code;
4040 (5) a building located in a place or area designated
4141 for its historical, cultural, or architectural importance and
4242 significance that a municipality may regulate under Section
4343 211.003(b), Local Government Code, if the municipality:
4444 (A) is a certified local government under the
4545 National Historic Preservation Act (54 U.S.C. Section 300101 et
4646 seq.); or
4747 (B) has an applicable landmark ordinance that
4848 meets the requirements under the certified local government program
4949 as determined by the Texas Historical Commission;
5050 (6) a building located in a place or area designated
5151 for its historical, cultural, or architectural importance and
5252 significance by a governmental entity, if designated before April
5353 1, 2019;
5454 (7) a building located in an area designated as a
5555 historic district on the National Register of Historic Places;
5656 (8) a building designated as a Recorded Texas Historic
5757 Landmark;
5858 (9) a building designated as a State Archeological
5959 Landmark or State Antiquities Landmark;
6060 (10) a building listed on the National Register of
6161 Historic Places or designated as a landmark by a governmental
6262 entity;
6363 (11) a building located in a World Heritage Buffer
6464 Zone;
6565 (12) a building located in an area designated for
6666 development, restoration, or preservation in a main street city
6767 under the main street program established under Section 442.014;
6868 (13) a standard for a plumbing product required by an
6969 ordinance or other regulation implementing a water conservation
7070 plan or program described by Section 11.1271 or 13.146, Water Code;
7171 [and]
7272 (14) a standard for a plumbing product imposed by the
7373 Texas Water Development Board as a condition of applying for or
7474 receiving financial assistance under a program administered by the
7575 board;
7676 (15) an energy code as adopted by the State Energy
7777 Conservation Office under Section 388.003(a) or (b), Health and
7878 Safety Code;
7979 (16) an energy and water conservation design standard
8080 established by the State Energy Conservation Office under Section
8181 447.004; and
8282 (17) a high-performance building standard approved by
8383 a board of regents under Section 55.115, Education Code.
8484 SECTION 2. Section 388.003, Health and Safety Code, is
8585 amended by amending Subsections (a), (b), and (b-2) and adding
8686 Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
8787 (a) To achieve energy conservation in single-family
8888 residential construction, the energy efficiency chapter of the
8989 International Residential Code, as it existed on May 1, 2001, is
9090 adopted as the energy code in this state for single-family
9191 residential construction. On September 1, 2016, the energy
9292 efficiency chapter of the International Residential Code, as it
9393 existed on May 1, 2015, is adopted as the energy code in this state
9494 for single-family residential construction. On or after September
9595 1, 2021, the State Energy Conservation Office may adopt and
9696 substitute for that energy code the latest published edition of the
9797 energy efficiency chapter of the International Residential Code,
9898 based on written findings on the stringency of the chapter
9999 submitted by the laboratory under Subsection (b-3). The office:
100100 (1) may not amend or adopt an edition under this
101101 subsection more often than once every six years; [and]
102102 (2) by rule shall establish an effective date for an
103103 adopted edition that is not earlier than nine months after the date
104104 of adoption; and
105105 (3) may amend an adopted edition.
106106 (a-1) Before amending or adopting an edition of the energy
107107 efficiency chapter of the International Residential Code under
108108 Subsection (a), the State Energy Conservation Office shall conduct
109109 an analysis that:
110110 (1) measures the impact of the amendment or adoption
111111 on housing attainability in this state; and
112112 (2) quantifies the incremental construction cost and
113113 energy use cost savings associated with construction to evaluate
114114 the cost-effectiveness of the proposed amendment or adoption.
115115 (a-2) The analysis under Subsection (a-1)(2) must calculate
116116 the payback period for any required products or minimum standards
117117 or requirements that are more stringent than the energy code in
118118 effect on the date immediately before the date the amendment or
119119 adoption would take effect.
120120 (b) To achieve energy conservation in all other
121121 residential, commercial, and industrial construction, the
122122 International Energy Conservation Code as it existed on May 1,
123123 2001, is adopted as the energy code for use in this state for all
124124 other residential, commercial, and industrial construction. The
125125 State Energy Conservation Office may adopt and substitute for that
126126 energy code the latest published edition of the International
127127 Energy Conservation Code, based on written findings on the
128128 stringency of the edition submitted by the laboratory under
129129 Subsection (b-3). The office:
130130 (1) by rule shall establish an effective date for an
131131 adopted edition that is not earlier than nine months after the date
132132 of adoption; and
133133 (2) may amend an adopted edition.
134134 (b-2) The State Energy Conservation Office by rule shall
135135 establish a procedure for persons who have an interest in the
136136 amendment or adoption of energy codes under Subsection (a) or (b) to
137137 have an opportunity to comment on the codes under
138138 consideration. The office shall consider persons who have an
139139 interest in adoption of those codes to include:
140140 (1) commercial and residential builders, architects,
141141 and engineers;
142142 (2) municipal, county, and other local government
143143 authorities;
144144 (3) environmental groups; and
145145 (4) manufacturers of building materials and products.
146146 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
147147 ______________________________ ______________________________
148148 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
149149 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2453 passed the Senate on
150150 May 3, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 17, Nays 14; and that the
151151 Senate concurred in House amendments on May 26, 2023, by the
152152 following vote: Yeas 17, Nays 14.
153153 ______________________________
154154 Secretary of the Senate
155155 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2453 passed the House, with
156156 amendments, on May 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 84,
157157 Nays 59, one present not voting.
158158 ______________________________
159159 Chief Clerk of the House
160160 Approved:
161161 ______________________________
162162 Date
163163 ______________________________
164164 Governor