Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2476 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 8, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 22, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 8, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023