Senate | 05/12/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |