House | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4047 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Zaffirini | Journal Page: 1765 |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1765 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1765 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4044 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |