House
|
05/23/2023
|
Postponed
|
8/17/26 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 5123
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5123
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2192
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5123
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Eckhardt
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|