Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2593 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 14, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Witness List

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023