Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2593 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Springer S.B. No. 2593
 (In the Senate - Filed April 3, 2023; April 5, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 1; April 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a defense to prosecution for certain assaultive
 offenses involving the use or exhibition of a less-lethal
 projectile device by a peace officer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 22, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 22.065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.065.  DEFENSE TO CERTAIN ASSAULTIVE OFFENSES
 INVOLVING LESS-LETHAL PROJECTILE DEVICE BY PEACE OFFICER. (a) In
 this section, "less-lethal projectile device" means any weapon,
 device, or munition that deploys a projectile that is designed or
 intended to temporarily incapacitate the target while minimizing
 the risk of serious bodily injury or death.
 (b)  It is a defense to prosecution of an offense under
 Section 22.01, 22.02, 22.04, or 22.05 that:
 (1)  the conduct constituting the offense involved the
 use or exhibition of a less-lethal projectile device;
 (2)  the actor used or exhibited the device while
 discharging the actor's official duties as a peace officer; and
 (3)  the actor did not intend to cause serious bodily
 injury or death when using or exhibiting the device.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to
 conduct that occurs before, on, or after the effective date of this
 Act, except that a final conviction for an offense that exists on
 the effective date of this Act is unaffected by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *