Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 29, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 9, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note April 30, 2023