E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3078
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3078
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3013
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2186
|
Journal Page: 5865
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5865
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2354
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4652
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1851
|
Journal Page: 4652
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4652
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4652
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4595
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1833
|
Journal Page: 4594
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4594
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Canales
|
Journal Page: 4594
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4594
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4387
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 966
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 966
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|