Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2601 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 24, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 20, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note April 25, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Conference Committee Report*

Bill
Fiscal Note