Senate | 05/17/2023 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1457 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 1457 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |