E
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective on adoption of const. amendment
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6426
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3278
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6367
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6366
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 6365
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3278
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5876
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5876
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2955
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2954
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5008
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1977
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4901
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1947
|
Journal Page: 4901
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4901
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
9-Patterson
|
Journal Page: 4900
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended 9-Patterson
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended 8-Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
6-Howard
|
Journal Page: 4897
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn 6-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended 5-AnchÃa
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended 4-AnchÃa
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended 3-AnchÃa and Patterson
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Goodwin
|
Journal Page: 4895
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4894
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Postponed
|
After SJR 93
|
Journal Page: 4891
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4891
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Public hearing continued on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3268
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Goodwin
|
Journal Page: 4895
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Metcalf, Leo-Wilson, K. King, VanDeaver, Orr, Bailes, Toth, Ortega, Smithee, Ashby, Price, More
|
Journal Page: 4894
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4891
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1564
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 1438
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|