Senate | 05/24/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2538 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2138 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1780 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1780 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |