Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2632 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/18/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hall, et al. S.B. No. 2632
 (In the Senate - Filed May 10, 2023; May 11, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 18, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2632 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to required labeling of food containing mRNA vaccine
 material.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 431, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 431.085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 431.085.  REQUIRED NOTICE ON FOOD CONTAINING MRNA
 VACCINE MATERIAL.  (a)  In this section, "mRNA vaccine material"
 means a substance included in a vaccine to stimulate the production
 of antibodies and provide immunity against disease by introducing
 messenger ribonucleic acid (mRNA) that corresponds to a viral
 protein.
 (b)  A person may not sell in this state food injected with an
 mRNA vaccine unless the food's label includes a clear and
 conspicuous notice that the food contains mRNA vaccine material.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 433, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 433.0415 to read as follows:
 Sec. 433.0415.  LABELING OF MEAT FOOD PRODUCTS CONTAINING
 MRNA VACCINE MATERIAL. (a)  In this section, "mRNA vaccine
 material" means a substance included in a vaccine to stimulate the
 production of antibodies and provide immunity against disease by
 introducing messenger ribonucleic acid (mRNA) that corresponds to a
 viral protein.
 (b)  A person may not sell in this state a meat food product
 derived from livestock injected with an mRNA vaccine unless the
 product's label includes a clear and conspicuous notice that the
 product contains mRNA vaccine material.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement the
 changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2024.
 * * * * *